List of presidents
Name | From | To | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
Julián Palacios | 1900 | 6 March 1902 | ||
Juan Padrós | 6 March 1902 | January 1904 | ||
Carlos Padrós | January 1904 | 1908 | ||
Adolfo Meléndez | 1908 | July 1916 | ||
Pedro Parages | July 1916 | 16 May 1926 | ||
Luis de Urquijo | 16 May 1926 | 1930 | ||
Luis Usera | 1930 | 31 May 1935 | ||
Rafael Sánchez Guerra | 31 May 1935 | 4 August 1936 | ||
Adolfo Meléndez | 4 August 1936 | 1940 | ||
Antonio Santos Peralba | 1940 | 11 September 1943 | ||
Santiago Bernabéu Yeste | 11 September 1943 | 2 June 1978 | ||
Luis de Carlos | September 1978 | 24 May 1985 | ||
Ramón Mendoza | 24 May 1985 | 26 November 1995 | ||
Lorenzo Sanz | 26 November 1995 | 16 July 2000 | ||
Florentino Pérez | 16 July 2000 | 27 February 2006 | ||
Fernando Martín Álvarez | 27 February 2006 | 26 April 2006 | ||
Luis Gómez-Montejano | 26 April 2006 | 2 July 2006 | ||
Ramón Calderón | 2 July 2006 | 16 January 2009 | ||
Vicente Boluda | 16 January 2009 | 31 May 2009 | ||
Florentino Pérez | 1 June 2009 | present |
0 komentar:
Posting Komentar